Jennifer Dawson v. Delta Airlines, Incorporated
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00113
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01289 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
DELTA AIRLINES, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JENNIFER SUZANNE DAWSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00113-CMH-WEF. Case manager: PBallard. [1001548993] 24-1289 PLB [Entered: 04/08/2024 10:50 AM] | |
2 | 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00113-CMH-WEF. [1001548997] 24-1289 PLB [Entered: 04/08/2024 10:53 AM] |