Emily Wright v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00803
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01291 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAPITAL ONE N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EMILY WRIGHT, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TIFFANY WILSON, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KRISHNENDU CHAKRABORTY, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRITTANY DELACRUZ, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00803-PTG-IDD. Case manager: TBarton. [1001549102] 24-1291 TB [Entered: 04/08/2024 11:46 AM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00803-PTG-IDD. [1001549121] 24-1291 TB [Entered: 04/08/2024 12:01 PM] |