NCO Financial Systems, Inc. v. Montgomery Park, LLC
Original Case: 1:11-cv-01020
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01294 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MONTGOMERY PARK, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-01020-GLR. Case manager: BevWashington. [1001549180] 24-1294 BAW [Entered: 04/08/2024 12:53 PM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-01020-GLR. [1001549215] 24-1294 BAW [Entered: 04/08/2024 01:21 PM] |