Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP v. SV Lola et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02667 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333ad Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 10:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gina A Bradshaw
314 Tower Ave.
Maybrook, NY 12453 |
|
Defendant
Kevin J Bradshaw
314 Tower Ave.
Maybrook, NY 12543 |
|
Defendant-in-Rem
SV Lola a/k/a Lucky Dog
|
|
Plaintiff
Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP
36 Hudson Drive
Stony Point, NY 10980 |
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 04/24 9:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Gina A Bradshaw served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by Kevin J. Bradshaw. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 04/24 9:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kevin J Bradshaw served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by Kevin J. Bradshaw. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin J Bradshaw..(jgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gina A Bradshaw..(jgo) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 3:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mele, Armand) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 3:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gina A. Bradshaw, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 3:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin J. Bradshaw, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 10:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Armand Philip Mele. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 10:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Armand Philip Mele. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $6,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/10 10:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Armand Philip Mele. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SV Lola a/k/a Lucky Dog. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 10:16 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 10:17 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Armand Philip Mele to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; remove party name listed above 'Clerk of Court'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 2:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin J. Bradshaw, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 2:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gina A. Bradshaw, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Gina A Bradshaw, Kevin J Bradshaw, SV Lola a/k/a Lucky Dog. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29192132)Document filed by Breakers Stony Point Marina, LP..(Mele, Armand) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USCG Search Page, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Claim of Lien, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Response to Notice of Claim of Lien, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Marina Contract, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |