Allen v. O'Malley
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 04/11 8:42 AM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant is directed to produce a Social Security Administrative Record/Transcript such that the bookmarks in the Social Security Administrative Record/Transcript are complete, in that, the entire transcript is linked to the index. The defendant shall produce a transcript that includes bookmarks for all of the exhibits in the administrative record, including all of the medical records. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/11/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Wed 04/10 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Vernon Norwood appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/9/2024. (Norwood, Vernon) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 9:12 AM
TEXT ORDER: Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. § 1915, Plaintiff's3 in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, Defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute Defendant's answer, within 90 days of said service, or a motion to dismiss the Complaint within 90 days of said service. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/9/2024. (jdc ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Tue 04/09 8:50 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, this action has been assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric and U.S. District Judge Brenda K. Sannes. The parties have not consented. (egr) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Tue 04/09 8:49 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Shannon Marie Allen advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (egr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 8:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon Marie Allen Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (egr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Tue 04/09 8:47 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (egr) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Tue 04/09 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(egr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A First Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B First AC Remand, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Second Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D Second AC Remand, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E Third Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F AC Denial, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |