Knappenberger v. O'Malley
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence E Kahn |
Referred: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00489 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 8:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/9/2024.(gmd) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Tue 04/09 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Geoffrey M. Peters appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/8/2024. (Peters, Geoffrey) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Tue 04/09 8:42 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . (hmr) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Tue 04/09 8:41 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Stefanie Nicole Knappenberger advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (hmr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 8:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stefanie Nicole Knappenberger Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (hmr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Tue 04/09 8:38 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (hmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Tue 04/09 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(hmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Appeals Council Denial, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |