Divine Hospitality, LLC v. Owners Insurance Company
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Louise Wood Flanagan |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00212 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 11:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Owners Insurance Company, MI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Divine Hospitality, LLC, NC
|
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 4:39 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Divine Hospitality, LLC (Carpenter, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Luther Carpenter on behalf of Divine Hospitality, LLC. (Carpenter, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 3:21 PM
ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, 1 Notice of Removal. Owners Insurance Company answer due 5/11/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/11/2024. Copy mailed to Michael L. Carpenter, Gray, Layton, Kersh, Solomon, Furr & Smith at P O Box 2636, Gastonia, NC 28053 (Collins, S) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice-other
Thu 04/11 10:02 AM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal sent to Counsel for Plaintiff advising of requirement to file a Notice of Appearance on this date via US mail to Michael L. Carpenter, Gray, Layton, Kersh, Solomon, Furr & Smith at P O Box 2636Gastonia, NC 28053. (Collins, S) |
|
utility
Motion Referred to Clerk
Thu 04/11 10:05 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/09 11:20 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Owners Insurance Company. (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 11:16 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:14 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Camilla Frances DeBoard on behalf of Owners Insurance Company. (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice-other
Tue 04/09 11:12 AM
Notice filed by Owners Insurance Company Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet . (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice-other
Tue 04/09 11:11 AM
Notice filed by Owners Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet . (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Vance County Superior Court, case number 24-CVS-178. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7558974), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (DeBoard, Camilla) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal |