Presidential Candidate Number P60005535 v. Biden et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Referred: | Shiva V Hodges |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01750 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 11:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hunter Biden
|
|
Defendant
President Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
Chief of Staff
|
|
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick Garland
|
|
Defendant
United States Secret Service
|
|
Defendant
White House, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Presidential Candidate Number P60005535
Sarasota, FL 34243
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 04/12 10:55 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Transfer of Case Management,7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Presidential Candidate Number P60005535 c/o Ronald Satish Emrit 6655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243. (apsn) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Transfer of Case Management
Fri 04/12 10:53 AM
***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 250 East North Street Greenville, SC 29601. (apsn) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 04/12 10:51 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district court summarily dismiss this matter without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 04/12/2024. (apsn) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff applied to proceed in the District Court without prepaying fees or costs. [ECF No. 3]. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the court construes this application as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. A review of the motion reveals that Plaintiff should be relieved of the obligation to prepay the full filing fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, subject to the court's right to require a payment if Plaintiff's financial condition changes, and to tax fees and costs against Plaintiff at the conclusion of this case if the court finds the case to be without merit. See Flint v. Haynes, 651 F.2d 970, 972-74 (4th Cir. 1981). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/12/24. (vhor) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 10:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Presidential Candidate Number P60005535. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Hunter Biden, Joe Biden, Chief of Staff, Merrick Garland, United States Secret Service, White House, The, filed by Presidential Candidate Number P60005535. (lbak) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |