Augustin, Maxime v. State of Florida et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14105 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Compliance
Tue 04/16 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Compliance per Order at DE3 , the Clerk has mailed a copy of the Order to the Petitioner. (wce) |
|
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Tue 04/16 9:02 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Petition [ECF No.1 ] is DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case and mail a copy of this order to Petitioner. Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 04/09 12:09 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/09 12:03 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by Maxime Augustin.(kma) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Records |