Gartenberg et al v. The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John P Cronan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02669 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:2000d Federally Assisted Programs |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art
|
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Gartenberg
|
|
Plaintiff
Perie Hoffman
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Khalili
|
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Kret
|
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Roslyn Lent
|
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Meiner
|
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Meiner
|
|
Plaintiff
Meghan Notkin
|
|
Plaintiff
Gila Rosenzweig
|
|
Plaintiff
Anna Weisman
|
Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 5:02 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lisa E. Cleary dated April 19, 2024. The request is granted. Cooper Union may respond to the Complaint by May 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art answer due 5/31/2024. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/22/2024) (jca) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/19 3:17 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lisa E. Cleary dated April 19, 2024. Document filed by The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art..(Cleary, Lisa) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Lee Bonneau on behalf of The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art..(Bonneau, Jacqueline) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa E. Cleary on behalf of The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art..(Cleary, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service Other
Wed 04/17 5:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint Jury Trial Demanded, Civil Cover Sheet, Unsigned Summons in a Civil Action, Appearance of Counsel for Debra E. Schreck, Appearance of Counsel for Baruch Weiss, Appearance of Counsel for Ziporah Reich, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases of John P. Cronan, United States District Judge of Southern District of New York served on non-party Office of the New York State Attorney General on April 12, 2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service Other
Wed 04/17 4:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint Jury Trial Demanded, Civil Cover Sheet, Unsigned Summons in a Civil Action, Appearance of Counsel for Debra E. Schreck, Appearance of Counsel for Baruch Weiss, Appearance of Counsel for Ziporah Reich, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases of John P. Cronan, United States District Judge of Southern District of New York served on non-party NYC Commission on Human Rights on 4/12/2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Wed 04/17 4:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint Jury Trial Demanded, Civil Cover Sheet, Unsigned Summons in a Civil Action, Appearance of Counsel for Debra E. Schreck, Appearance of Counsel for Baruch Weiss, Appearance of Counsel for Ziporah Reich, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases of John P. Cronan, United States District Judge of Southern District of New York served on non-party NYC Commission on Human Rights c/o Corporation Counsel of The City of New York on 4/11/2024. Service was accepted by Jerry Bradshaw. Document filed by Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/17 1:35 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Service was accepted by Siri McDonald. Document filed by Benjamin Meiner; Jacob Khalili; Michelle Meiner; Gila Rosenzweig; Perie Hoffman; Meghan Notkin; Rebecca Gartenberg; Gabriel Kret; Anna Weisman; Taylor Roslyn Lent..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 10:33 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 10:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 10:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 10:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ziporah Reich on behalf of Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman. |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Baruch Weiss on behalf of Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Weiss, Baruch) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Debra E. Schreck on behalf of Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Schreck, Debra) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 12:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rebecca Gartenberg, Perie Hoffman, Jacob Khalili, Gabriel Kret, Taylor Roslyn Lent, Benjamin Meiner, Michelle Meiner, Meghan Notkin, Gila Rosenzweig, Anna Weisman..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 12:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stiefel, Aaron) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT against The Cooper Union for the Advancement of Science and Art. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29193835)Document filed by Benjamin Meiner, Jacob Khalili, Michelle Meiner, Gila Rosenzweig, Perie Hoffman, Meghan Notkin, Rebecca Gartenberg, Gabriel Kret, Anna Weisman, Taylor Roslyn Lent..(Stiefel, Aaron) |