Raven Production Management Group, LLC v. Phantom Labs, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John P Cronan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02670 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sean P. Diddy Combs
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW LUPTON
|
|
Defendant
Phantom Labs, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Raven Production Management Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean P. Diddy Combs..(jgo) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phantom Labs, Inc...(jgo) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Lupton..(jgo) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/23 4:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean P. Diddy Combs, re:6 Complaint. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/23 4:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew Lupton, re:6 Complaint. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/23 4:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phantom Labs, Inc., re:6 Complaint. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/23 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Sean P. Diddy Combs, Matthew Lupton, Phantom Labs, Inc.. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 04/23 4:00 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Eisweirth to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/23 4:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Eisweirth to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each summons request must be filed separately; summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29244508)Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/19 2:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phantom Labs, Inc.; Sean P. Diddy Combs; Matthew Lupton, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Request for Summons | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/10 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Eisweirth to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas Eisweirth to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF case caption does not match as it appears on the pleading caption; multiple Nature of Suit codes was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Eisweirth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/10 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Eisweirth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MATTHEW LUPTON. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 10:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 10:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 10:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 11:48 AM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 11:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Sean P. Diddy Combs. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29193329)Document filed by Raven Production Management Group, LLC..(Eisweirth, Thomas) |