BAUCUM v. IANNAMORELLI et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia L Dodge |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00529 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
RAYMOND DUPILKA
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY IANNAMORELLI
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW SCHIMIZZI
|
|
Defendant
WESTMORELAND COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE
|
|
Plaintiff
GREGORY BAUCUM
1739 Wesley St.
Wilkinsburg, PA 15601 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/12 8:53 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff is advised that a second case was inadvertently opened at 2:24-cv-529 with documents intended to be filed at Plaintiff's existing case 2:23-cv-1790. The claims are against the same Defendants, and the lodged Complaint [ECF No. 1] appears to be missing pages. These missing pages supplement the lodged Complaint [ECF No. 4-2] in 2:23-cv-1790 and will be filed at that case number as a supplement to the pending Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 4]. The Clerk of Court is to mark this case CLOSED as it is a duplicate of Plaintiff's existing case filed at 2:23-cv-1790. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/12/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
utility
Remark for lodged complaint
Wed 04/10 10:56 AM
Remark: Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (jd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 10:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (jd) |