Taylor v. Galloway et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00412 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 3:05 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff also filed an Application for Leave for Proceed In Forma Pauperis.2 . There are two problems with Plaintiff's IFP Application. To proceed with this action, Plaintiff must fix these problems or submit the $405 civil filing fee. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/30/2024. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/24 8:16 AM
MOTION for Supenia Parties by Caleb Taylor. (kc) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/24 8:15 AM
Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Galloway, Officer Silvers, Kristen Smith, filed by Caleb Taylor.(kc) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 04/09 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 04/09 10:36 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 10:36 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Caleb Taylor. (af) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian Galloway, Officer Silvers, Kristen Smith, filed by Caleb Taylor.(af) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Pleading Form, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Multiple Documents | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Tue 04/09 10:38 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (af) |