Rosen v. Amazon.com Inc et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02673 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:12 PM EDT |
ADR Provider
AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, WA 98109 |
|
ADR Provider
MARIANNA ROSEN
330 WYTHE AVENUE
BOOKLYN, NY 11249 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc
410 TERRY AVENUE N
SEATTLE, WA 98109 |
|
Defendant
CYCLACE
410 TERRY AVENUE N
SEATTLE, WA 98109 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 04/24 10:07 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-03043, filed on 04/23/2024..(bc) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 04/23 3:22 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(ks) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 3:21 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/23/2024) (ks) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Tue 04/23 11:30 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from William T. Lawson, III dated 04/23/2024 re: Consent to transfer. Document filed by Marianna Rosen..(Lawson, William) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 4:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc, Cyclace..(jgo) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 3:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc; Amazon.com Services, LLC; Cyclace, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marianna Rosen..(Lawson, William) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/11 2:10 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than April 25, 2024 as to why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York, the Court requests that Plaintiff submit a letter stating that it consents to the transfer of this action to the Eastern District of New York no later than April 25, 2024. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/11/2024) (rro) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 2:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William T Lawson, III to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title contains a typo;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 12:41 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marianna Rosen..(Lawson, William) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 12:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc; Amazon.com Services, LLC; Cyclace, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marianna Rosen..(Lawson, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 12:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lawson, William) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/10 9:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William T Lawson, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, Amazon.com Inc, CYCLACE, MARIANNA ROSEN. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 10:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney William T Lawson, III to Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form is not signed; the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. The civil cover sheet is filed as its own individual ECF Event. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 10:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William T Lawson, III to Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Summons Request are filed as its own individual ECF Event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Wed 04/10 10:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney William T Lawson, III to Document 1 Complaint. The Rule 7.1 Statement is filed as its own individual ECF Event. Use the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 10:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William T Lawson, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability); Dollar Demand $350,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); the Dollar Demand has been modified to Blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 10:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 10:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 10:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, Amazon.com Inc, CYCLACE. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29193696)Document filed by MARIANNA ROSEN..(Lawson, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement RUKE 7.1 STATEMENT |