CORRETTO LLC v. Erie Insurance Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02674 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Supreme Court of State of NY County of New York, 651272/2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Erie Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CORRETTO LLC
|
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response (non-motion)
Thu 04/18 8:30 PM
RESPONSE re:4 Letter . Document filed by Corretto LLC..(Androphy, Joshua) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Mon 04/15 1:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from William O. Krekstein dated April 15, 2024 re: to request a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Erie Insurance Company..(Krekstein, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/10 8:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William O. Krekstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CORRETTO LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 8:57 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 8:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 8:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 12:57 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Erie Insurance Exchange for Erie Insurance Company. Document filed by Erie Insurance Company..(Krekstein, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 12:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Krekstein, William) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 651272/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29193791).Document filed by Erie Insurance Company..(Krekstein, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Statement of Financial Affairs |