Cockburn v. Yard House USA Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02675 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Yard House USA Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicolas Cockburn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 4:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yard House USA Inc...(pc) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/11 5:13 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/11/2024) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 12:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yard House USA Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicolas Cockburn..(Spasojevich, Lawrence) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 10:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Spasojevich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 10:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 11:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 11:03 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 11:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Spasojevich to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 12:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yard House USA Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicolas Cockburn..(Spasojevich, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 12:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spasojevich, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Yard House USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29193826)Document filed by Nicolas Cockburn..(Spasojevich, Lawrence) |