Berg v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00670 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Berg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 5:18 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Tolton, William) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/29 2:57 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may respond to the complaint by May 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 29, 2024. (DAD) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/29 1:32 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Related case(s): No (Tolton, William) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/29 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William Jeremiah Tolton, III on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Lead Counsel: Wm. Jere Tolton, III, Esq.. (Tolton, William) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 04/29 12:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint / File Responsive Pleading by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Order by Nicholas Berg. (Hill, Herbert) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/15 11:46 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nicholas Berg. Related case(s): No (Hill, Herbert) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons returned executed
Fri 04/12 12:10 PM
RETURN of service executed on 4/11/2024 by Nicholas Berg as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Herbert) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
15
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 2:15 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/10/2024. (GNB) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Tue 04/09 3:09 PM
SUMMONS issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (HAI) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/09 1:25 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-670-JSS-RMN. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21961672) filed by Nicholas Berg.(Hill, Herbert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |