Atkins v. National Medical Administrators, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
National Medical Administrators, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ervin Atkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 04/22 11:54 AM
RETURN of service executed on 4/19/2024 by Ervin Atkins as to National Medical Administrators, Inc. (Taylor, Alexander) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 04/15 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/11 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexander J. Taylor on behalf of Ervin Atkins. Lead Counsel: Alexander J. Taylor. (Taylor, Alexander) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/10 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alexander J. Taylor of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABM) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/10 11:09 AM
SUMMONS issued as to National Medical Administrators, Inc. (ABM) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/09 12:28 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-871-TPB-NHA. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against National Medical Administrators, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21961794) filed by Ervin Atkins.(Taylor, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |