Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 2:24-cv-00120
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
1601 Elm Street, Suite 4360
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Brennan H Meier PHV
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld Llp - Dal/tx
contact info
M Scott Barnard PHV
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld Llp - Dal/tx
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Caudill
on behalf of themselves individually and all others similarly situated
949 Alderbrook Court, IN 46307
Represented By
Kevin D Stanley PHV
Humphrey Farrington & Mcclain PC
contact info
Kevin G Harvey
Allen Wellman Harvey Keyes Cooley Llp - Gre/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Jana Caudill
on behalf of themselves individually and all others similarly situated 949 Alderbrook Court
Crown Point, IN 46307
Represented By
Kevin D Stanley PHV
Humphrey Farrington & Mcclain PC
contact info
Kevin G Harvey
Allen Wellman Harvey Keyes Cooley Llp - Gre/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/04 2:45 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 9/4/2024. (lns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 09/03 2:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Jana Caudill, Dennis Caudill. (Stanley PHV, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/14 5:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Class Action Complaint by Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Barnard PHV, M)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Brief in Support Wed 08/14 5:31 PM
BRIEF in Support of17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Barnard PHV, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
17 17 motion Dismiss Wed 08/14 5:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Barnard PHV, M)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 5:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Barnard PHV, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 08/13 5:36 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/05 2:09 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 8/14/2024. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/5/24. (slm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 07/02 5:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Barnard PHV, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/27 11:17 AM
ORDER granting9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney M Scott Barnard PHV for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/27/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/27 11:07 AM
ORDER granting8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brennan H Meier PHV for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/27/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/07 9:35 AM
ORDER granting10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint . Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 7/10/2024. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/7/2024. (eeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/06 12:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Barnard, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:37 AM
Application for Attorney M. Scott Barnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5592051(Meier, Brennan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:35 AM
Application for Attorney Brennan H. Meier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5592037(Meier, Brennan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 02, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/02 11:44 AM
ORDER granting6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin D Stanley PHV for Dennis Caudill and Jana Caudill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/2/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 12:13 PM
Application for Attorney Kevin D. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jana Caudill and Dennis Caudill. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5561032(Stanley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/12 10:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jana Caudill, Dennis Caudill. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Harvey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 7:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Keller Williams Realty, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 2 pgs service Proposed Summons Thu 04/11 9:46 AM
Proposed Summons filed by Dennis Caudill, Jana Caudill. (Harvey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/10 9:51 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G Harvey on behalf of Dennis Caudill, Jana Caudill (Harvey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/09 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Class Action against Keller Williams Realty, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5539550.), filed by Jana Caudill.(Harvey, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet