Gardella v. Manhattanville College
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02677 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Manhattanville College
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter (Petra) Gardella
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Joseph Cronen on behalf of Peter (Petra) Gardella..(Cronen, H.) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 9:45 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Manhattanville College served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Person. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Peter (Petra) Gardella..(Charny, Nathaniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 11:53 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manhattanville College..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 11:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nathaniel K. Charny. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 11:51 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 11:52 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 11:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 1:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattanville College, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Peter (Petra) Gardella..(Charny, Nathaniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 1:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Charny, Nathaniel) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Manhattanville College. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29194395)Document filed by Peter (Petra) Gardella..(Charny, Nathaniel) |