Garrett v. Yost et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01642 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Division of Disability Determination
|
|
Defendant
Rachel Ganqwer
|
|
Defendant
Kengi Sese Koker
|
|
Defendant
Social Services - Northland Village
|
|
Defendant
G. Gary Tyack
|
|
Defendant
Dave Yost
Attorney General of Ohio 30 East Broad St., 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Plaintiff
Allen Dupree Garrett
1450 Park Club Drive
Westerville, OH 43081 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/24 12:09 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/24/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Brief
Tue 04/23 10:44 AM
Second Legal Argument BRIEF by Plaintiff Allen Dupree Garrett. (er) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 11:23 AM
This entry is for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF3 for document. (mas) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/12 11:20 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Complaint. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.1 ) is GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Objections to R&R due by 4/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/12/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Division of Disability Determination, Rachel Ganqwer, Kengi Sese Koker, Social Services - Northland Village, G. Gary Tyack, Dave Yost filed by Allen Dupree Garrett. (mas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 8:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Allen Dupree Garrett. (er) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope |