Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-13422

Mississippi Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Selene D Maddox
Case #: 1:24-ap-01017
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Freight, LLC
Registered Agent Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange St.
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
American Freight, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Henderson, Liquidating Trustee for United Furniture Industries, Inc., et al., Pursuant To The Liquidating Trust Agreement, Dated March 30, 2024
Chapter 11 Trustee of United Furniture 1765-A Lelia Drive Suite 103
Jackson, MS 39216
Represented By
E. Frank Childress, Jr.
Baker, Donelson, Bearman,
contact info
R. Spencer Clift, III
contact info
Locke Houston Waldrop
Baker Donelson
contact info
Trustee
Derek A. Henderson
Chapter 11 Trustee 1765-A Lelia Drive Suite 103
Jackson, MS 39216
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
501 East Court Street, Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Saturday, April 05, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 04/05 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/05/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, April 03, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 04/03 2:08 PM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding. Entered on Docket by: (MDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
20 20 misc Document Wed 11/13 8:13 AM
Document Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Suggestion of Stay Filed by Hiawatha Northington II on behalf of American Freight, LLC. (Northington, Hiawatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Voluntary Petition for Bankruptcy
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
court Hearing Held Tue 10/22 3:30 PM
Hearing Held. Matter taken under advisement. Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (JF)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Sunday, September 01, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 09/01 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/01/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, August 30, 2024
18 18 order Set/Reset Hearing Fri 08/30 2:08 PM
Agreed Order Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. The Hearing date is scheduled for 10/22/2024 at 01:30 PM at Cochran U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse. Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Saturday, July 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 07/20 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/20/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, July 18, 2024
16 16 court Hearing Not Held; Continued/Rescheduled Thu 07/18 10:28 AM
Hearing Not Held; Continued/Rescheduled. Related [+]. The Hearing date is scheduled for 9/12/2024 at 01:30 PM at Cochran U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse. Entered on Docket by: (JF)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 answer Response Mon 07/15 6:39 PM
Response /Reply Filed by Hiawatha Northington II on behalf of American Freight, LLC Related [+]. (Northington, Hiawatha)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 answer Response Mon 07/01 2:03 PM
Response in Opposition Filed by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of Derek A. Henderson Related [+]. (Waldrop, Locke)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 06/14 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/14/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 06/12 9:57 AM
Order Granting Motion for John C. Cannizzaro To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-] 8
Saturday, June 08, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 06/08 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/08/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, June 06, 2024
10 10 order Submit Proposed Order Thu 06/06 11:34 AM
The court hereby orders and directs Hiawatha Northington II to submit a proposed order Related [+]. Order Due by 6/20/2024 Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
9 9 court Hearing Set (Document) Thu 06/06 11:32 AM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. The Hearing date is scheduled for 7/30/2024 at 10:00 AM at Cochran U.S. Bankruptcy Courthouse. Responses due by 7/2/2024. Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant American Freight, LLC
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
8 8 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 06/05 4:11 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Hiawatha Northington II on behalf of American Freight, LLC. (Northington, Hiawatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of John C. Cannizzaro
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/05 4:04 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Hiawatha Northington II on behalf of American Freight, LLC. (Northington, Hiawatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, UFI Claim
Friday, May 17, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Service Fri 05/17 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/17/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 order Extend/Shorten Time Wed 05/15 9:04 AM
Agreed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Deadline extended to June 7, 2024. Related [+] Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-] 4
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 05/15 9:17 AM
American Freight, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 6/7/2024. Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
4 4 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 05/10 4:28 PM
Motion To Extend Time to file Responsive Pleading, Unopposed Filed by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of Derek Henderson. (Waldrop, Locke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/09 3:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on American Freight, LLC 4/9/2024 .. (Waldrop, Locke)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/09 2:25 PM
Summons Issued on American Freight, LLC. Entered on Docket by: (MRH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/09 9:10 AM
Adversary case 24-01017 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) : Complaint by Derek Henderson against American Freight, LLC.. (Waldrop, Locke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit