59
|
|
59
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Wed 05/01 5:49 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Mailing Matrix Creditor Matrix
|
58
|
|
58
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Wed 05/01 4:50 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Amended Petition Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Duggar, Michael)
|
| |
Att: 1
Mailing Matrix Creditor Matrix
|
57
|
|
57
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Wed 05/01 4:01 PM
Amended Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Kathleen L. DiSanto and Verified Statement. Amended to reflect the correct time and date of the Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for May 8, 2024, at 3:30 p.m . Kathleen L DiSanto added to the case. Filed by Bryan E Buenaventura on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Buenaventura, Bryan)
Related: [-]
|
56
|
|
56
order
Ore Tenus Motion
Tue 04/30 9:54 AM
Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Seal Disclosure of Compensation Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 34
|
55
|
|
55
misc
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
Mon 04/29 4:28 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors for Schedules G and Summary of Assets Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
54
|
|
54
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 04/29 3:48 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Kathleen L. DiSanto and Verified Statement . Kathleen L DiSanto added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Buenaventura, Bryan)
Related: [-]
|
53
|
|
53
misc
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
Mon 04/29 3:00 PM
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
52
|
|
52
1
pgs
order
Order Striking
Mon 04/29 9:55 AM
Order Striking 2nd Amended Voluntary Petition Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.)
|
51
|
|
51
2
pgs
order
Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf
Mon 04/29 9:48 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2024 at 09:30 AM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4A, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . Service Instructions: Clerk's Office is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) Modified on 4/29/2024 (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
|
50
|
|
50
2
pgs
order
Order on Application to Employ/Retain
Mon 04/29 9:43 AM
Order Disapproving Application to Employ/Retain Accountant Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.)
|
49
|
|
49
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. No signed declaration for Schedule G & Summary Related [+]. (Lisa P.)
|
48
|
|
48
misc
Amended Voluntary Petition
Mon 04/29 9:22 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Reason for Amendment: Correct Mistaken on 2nd amended petition. 3rd amended petition Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
47
|
|
47
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 04/29 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
|
46
|
|
46
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Fri 04/26 5:51 PM
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
answer
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Fri 04/26 5:12 PM
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
44
|
|
44
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Fri 04/26 4:29 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
misc
Amended Voluntary Petition
Fri 04/26 3:32 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Reason for Amendment: Elect subchapter V. 2nd amended petition Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
misc
Summary of Assets
Fri 04/26 2:55 PM
Amended Summary of Assets Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Fri 04/26 2:40 PM
Schedule G, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
40
|
|
40
order
Ore Tenus Motion
Fri 04/26 12:55 PM
Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Strike Amended Petition and Disclosure of Compensation Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Penny)
Related: [-] 33
|
39
|
|
39
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Fri 04/26 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
|
38
|
|
38
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 04/25 12:39 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Michael J. Duggar on behalf of Debtor Regal Sand Realty, LLC. (Duggar, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
|
36
|
|
36
1
pgs
order
Order Striking
Wed 04/24 3:49 PM
Order Striking Amended Voluntary Petition Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia)
|
35
|
|
35
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Wed 04/24 1:24 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference CONTINUED TO MAY 2 @ 9:00 AOCNFN. ORE TENUS MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED PETITION AND DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION GRANTED (AS STATED ON THE RECORD) ORDER BUENAVENTURA. ORE TENUS MOTION TO SEAL DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION GRANTED ORDER BUENAVENTURA. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
motion
Ore Tenus Motion (court use only)
Wed 04/24 11:43 AM
Ore Tenus Motion to Seal Disclosure of Compensation Filed by Bryan E Buenaventura on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA Related [+]. (Kate)
|
33
|
|
33
motion
Ore Tenus Motion (court use only)
Wed 04/24 11:42 AM
Ore Tenus Motion to Strike Amended Petition and Disclosure of Compensation Filed by Bryan E Buenaventura on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA Related [+]. (Kate)
|