McCray, Terrelance v. Florida Department of Corrections
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21319 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/25 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina L. Dominguez on behalf of Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Christina L. Dominguez added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Dominguez, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause Order Reopening Case
Tue 04/23 3:32 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By May 24, 2024 , the Respondent shall file a Response Memorandum of fact and law, explaining exactly why the Petition should not be granted. The Clerk is instructed to REOPEN the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (cps) |
|
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/23 12:34 PM
ORDER of Instruction Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Mon 04/22 10:22 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/19/2024 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS285669. (vt) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/12 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Magaly Rodriguez on behalf of Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Magaly Rodriguez added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Rodriguez, Magaly) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 04/10 11:24 AM
CLERK NOTICE of Compliance re3 Order. Copy of Order [DE 3] mail out to the plaintiff along with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (kma) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/10 11:13 AM
ORDER Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing of Motion to Proceed IFP. On or before April 30, 2024, the Petitioner shall either pay the Clerks filing fee of $5.00 or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing Fee due by 4/30/2024.) Case closed for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (kma) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Proceed IFP (Long Form) | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 04/09 2:37 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/09 2:29 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by Terrelance McCray.(kma) |