I-D- v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah L Boardman |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01038 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
UR M JADDOU
Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
|
Defendant
Susan Raufer
Director, Newark Asylum Office USCIS Gateway 3 100 Mulberry Street, Suite 199
Newark, NJ 07102 |
|
Defendant
USCIS
Office of the Chief Counsel U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
|
Plaintiff
I- D-
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/17 2:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by I- D-(Gulen, Muhammed) |
|
Att: 1 certified mail receipt | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Unredacted Document
Mon 04/15 3:22 PM
UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Gulen, Muhammed) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/15 3:19 PM
MOTION re1 Complaint by I- D-(Gulen, Muhammed) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/11 9:24 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by I- D- was filed incorrectly. **Full, unredacted version of the complaint is required. Please file a copy of complaint including Plaintiff's full name using the event "Unredacted Document", located under Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 04/10 10:31 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Ur M. Jaddou, Susan Raufer, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 04/10 10:22 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by I- D- was filed incorrectly. ****Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(a) "The title of the Complaint must name all the parties". To proceed using a pseudonym, file a Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym using - Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Motions Miscellaneous Relief. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 04/09 2:37 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by I- D- as to All Defendants.(Gulen, Muhammed) |
|
Att: 1 summons, | ||
Att: 2 summons, | ||
Att: 3 summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11193215.), filed by I- D-.(Gulen, Muhammed) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |