Mazzaccone v. Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Rearden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02681 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Massimo Mazzaccone
individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated c/o Duane Morris LLP 1540 Broadway
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 1:16 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A. served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. Service was accepted by Osmara Martinez, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Massimo Mazzaccone..(Costantini, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Lamerce on behalf of Massimo Mazzaccone..(Lamerce, Stephanie) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 11:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Costantini, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 9:36 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A.. (vf) |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Wed 04/10 9:27 AM
Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 405.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-29195053, paid on 4/9/2024. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 9:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Anthony J. Costantini. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 9:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 9:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 9:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Massimo Mazzaccone..(Costantini, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Corporacion Electrica Nacional S.A.. Document filed by Massimo Mazzaccone..(Costantini, Anthony) |