BAILEY et al v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Chad F Kenney |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01470 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
ONE NATIONWIDE PLAZA
COLUMBUS, OH 43215 |
|
Plaintiff
BARRY BAILEY
37 FRANKLIN AVENUE
BRYN MAWR, PA 19010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE BAILEY
H/W 37 FRANKLIN AVENUE
BRYN MAWR, PA 19010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 04/23 7:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PARAGRAPHS 54 AND 55 (a)-(j) ARE WITHDRAWN FROM THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/23/24. 4/23/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
11 | 11
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 04/23 12:24 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Vance, Bradley) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACQUELINE BAILEY, BARRY BAILEY re: Federal Express served Summons and Complaint upon NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY by Federal Express/Registered Mail and Personal. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. (MILLER, ROBERT) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 4:27 PM
Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Vance, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 3:25 PM
STIPULATION to Withdraw Paragraphs 54 and 55(a)-(j) From the Complaint by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Vance, Bradley) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Vance on behalf of NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(Vance, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Disclosure of Citizenship
Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by BARRY BAILEY, JACQUELINE BAILEY re5 Order, . (MILLER, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 11:32 AM
ORDER THAT BECAUSE THERE IS DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP BETWEEN THE PARTIES, EACH PARTY TO THE ACTION IS REQUIRED AND ORDERED TO FILE OF RECORD THEIR DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/10/24. 4/10/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 11:27 AM
NOTICE THAT THE PARTIES ARE HEREBY NOTICED THAT THIS CASE HAS BEEN FLAGGED AS ELIGIBLE FOR MANDATORY ARBITRATION AND AN ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN APPROXIMATELY 120 DAYS OF THE FILING OF AN ANSWER. NO INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) WILL BE HELD; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/10/24. 4/10/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 11:23 AM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 12 (b)(6),(e) OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/10/24. 4/10/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 3:18 PM
Summons Issued as to NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 4/9/24 (JL) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17385831.), filed by JACQUELINE BAILEY, BARRY BAILEY.(MILLER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form |