PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Paradise Baxter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00103 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff
PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 12:48 PM
Summons Reissued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (USPS) (bjr) |
|
8 | 8
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Mon 04/15 11:04 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY (Molczan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (USPS) (bjr) |
|
6 | 6
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Fri 04/12 2:30 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY (Molczan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/10 2:18 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY (Molczan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Wed 04/10 11:43 AM
Errata re2 Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correct header of document to reflect Western District of Pennsylvania. (Molczan, William) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Wed 04/10 11:42 AM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correct header of document to reflect Western District of Pennsylvania. (Molczan, William) |
|
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Wed 04/10 4:04 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re5 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Incomplete defendant name. CORRECTION: File a Praecipe as the main document and all summons to issue as attachments. (bjr) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Tue 04/09 3:33 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Progressive Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Molczan, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/09 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8206673), filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Molczan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Tue 04/09 4:25 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,2 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Documents have Eastern District of Pennsylvania headers. CORRECTION: File errata with correct case number on the documents and link to complaint. (bjr) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Tue 04/09 4:26 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Summons has incorrect case number. CORRECTION: File a Praecipe as the main document and summons to issue as attachment. (bjr) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 4:33 PM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter added. (bjr) |