KLANCHAR v. UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie L Haines |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00074 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441cr Notice of Removal - Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Cambria County Court of Common Pleas, 24-00952 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS
110 Sunray Drive Suite 1
Johnstown, PA 15905 |
|
Plaintiff
JOHN A. KLANCHAR
104 Dahlia Street
Johnstown, PA 15905 |
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/18 2:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re2 Notice by UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS (Brown, Sheryl) Modified text on 4/18/2024 to add document linkage. (kss) |
|
misc
QC - Document incorrectly linked
Thu 04/18 3:43 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Document not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 04/16 9:35 PM
BRIEF in Support re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS. (Brown, Sheryl) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/16 9:34 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service re1 Notice of Removal, by UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS. (Brown, Sheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Faith | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 10:46 AM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 4/11/2024. (dag) |
|
2 | 2
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Thu 04/11 10:41 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/09 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cambria County, case number 2024-0952. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8206765), filed by UPPER YODER TOWNSHIP SUPERVISORS. (Brown, Sheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 9:04 AM
Judge Stephanie L. Haines added. (kss) |