California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-02872
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 1:32 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Glenn Sands
Plaintiff
Alcon 3PL, Inc.
Represented By
K. Tom Kohan
Kohan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/15 3:37 PM
Notice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed by PLAINTIFF Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/11 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Case should have been closed on entry dated April 9, 2025. Other: Default Judgment by Clerk entered against Defendant in favor of Plaintiff (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
32 32 order Clerks Entry of Default JUDGMENT Wed 04/09 3:08 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR SUM CERTAIN AGAINST DEFENDANT GLENN SANDS entered in favor of Alcon 3PL, Inc. against Glenn Sands in the principal amount of $100,000, interest in the amount of $13,042.40, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $13042.40. RE: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)16 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
31 31 motion Default Judgment Sat 04/05 10:38 AM
REQUEST for Default Judgment against DEFENDANT GLENN SANDS filed by PLAINTIFF Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DECLARATION OF K. TOM KOHAN,
Att: 2 PROPOSED CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR SUM CERTAIN
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 03/12 4:47 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than seven days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to those defendant(s). (See document for further information). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Lien Wed 02/19 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Interested Party B Z Resources Corporation. (Hussain, Muhammed)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 02/10 3:58 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER STRIKING by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgment ("Motion"). Dkt. 25. However, it appears Plaintiff is seeking Entry of Default Judgment by Clerk pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Hence, Plaintiff's Motion is hereby STRICKEN and Plaintiff shall file their motion as a Motion for Default Judgment by Clerk. Plaintiff shall select the correct docket entry during filing that indicates this and state Request for Clerk's Default Judgment Sum Certain. Counsel are further directed to comply with all applicable rules, including Local Rules 58-5, 58-7, and 58-11. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/06 10:35 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. 25] appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for February 13, 2025 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Fri 01/24 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual25 filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
25 25 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/03 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
24 24 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Tue 12/17 3:26 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby ORDERS the documents listed below be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Court's Local Rules, General Orders, and/or Case Management Order, as indicated: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual23 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
23 23 motion Default Judgment Thu 12/12 12:30 PM
APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DECLARATION OF K. TOM KOHAN,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, December 05, 2024
22 22 order Default Judgment Thu 12/05 4:06 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order DENYING Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment [Dkt. 18] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file a renewed application by no later than December 12, 2024. (See document for further information).; denying18 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/25 3:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. 18] appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for December 5, 2024 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
20 20 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 10/25 3:11 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Dkt.18 . The Court's October 11, 2024 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Plaintiff is nonetheless expressly warned that failure to timely comply with future Orders will result in this action being dismissed without prejudice and/or sanctions, including monetary sanctions, for failure to prosecute and comply with Court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 4:24 PM
Notice OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Default Judgment Fri 10/18 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant GLENN SANDS, an individual filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DECLARATION OF K. TOM KOHAN,
Att: 2 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES,
Att: 3 PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Friday, October 11, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/11 11:28 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than seven days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to those defendant(s). (See document for further information). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 08/23 11:38 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Glenn Sands (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
15 15 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 08/22 11:01 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Glenn Sands filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/01 1:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc., upon Defendant Glenn Sands served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
13 13 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 07/25 3:54 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Response to the Court's July 12, 2024 Order to Show Cause. Dkt. 12. The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Dkt. 11. Plaintiff is nonetheless expressly warned that failure to timely comply with future Orders will result in this action being dismissed without prejudice and/or sanctions, including monetary sanctions, for failure to prosecute and comply with Court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Additionally, Plaintiff shall file a proof of service of the summons and complaint by no later than September 17, 2024. Plaintiff is explicitly warned that failure to comply may result in sanctions including dismissal for failure to prosecute and/or comply with Court orders. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
12 12 misc Declaration Fri 07/19 4:52 PM
DECLARATION of K. TOM KOHAN re Order to Show Cause,11 filed by Plaintiff Alcon 3PL, Inc.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/15 9:13 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before July 19, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to those defendant(s). (See document for further information) (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
10 10 15 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 2:39 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 04/19 1:11 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-02872-KK (PVCx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-02872-KK (PVCx). Signed by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/11 1:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Glenn Sands. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/10 3:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/10 3:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/10 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/09 1:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ALCON 3PL, INC.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/09 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ALCON 3PL, INC., identifying None. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff ALCON 3PL, INC.. (Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/09 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37252236 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff ALCON 3PL, INC.. (Attorney K. Tom Kohan added to party ALCON 3PL, INC.(pty:pla))(Kohan, K.)
Related: [-]