Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandon S Long
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:24-cv-00887
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Marine Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 5:13 AM CDT
Defendant
GO Marine Services, LLC
Represented By
Sean T. McLaughlin
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Lauren Guichard Hoskin
Kean Miller, LLP
contact info
Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.
Represented By
Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Carlos J. Saravia
Phelps Dunbar, L.L.P.
contact info
Sean T. McLaughlin
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Ashley Frances Bossier
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Lauren Guichard Hoskin
Kean Miller, LLP
contact info
Colin B. Cambre
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonon Suazo
Represented By
Marc Evan Kutner
Spagnoletti Law Firm
contact info
Randy Jay Ungar
Ungar Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/28 9:25 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the35 joint motion to continue selected pretrial deadlines is GRANTED. The Court's Scheduling Order is amended as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 3/27/2025.(meb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
35 35 motion Continue Thu 03/27 10:06 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Selected Pretrial Deadlines by GO Marine Services, LLC, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C..(Hoskin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/24 4:31 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Dismiss Claim for Maintenance and Cure; FURTHER ORDER denying as moot29 Motion to Dismiss; FURTHER ORDER denying as moot23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 1/24/2025. (lag)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 11:30 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION to Dismiss Claim for Maintenance and Cure With Prejudice by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 4:13 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GO Marine Services, LLC, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C. filed by Leonon Suazo.(meb)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 01/17 4:12 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 1/16/2025. (meb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
30 30 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/14 12:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Leonon Suazo re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Maintenance and Cure under McCorpen . (Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss Mon 01/13 10:30 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Claim for Maintenance and Cure With Prejudice by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Mon 01/13 10:25 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading
Friday, December 20, 2024
27 27 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/20 4:59 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the26 second unopposed motion of Plaintiff Leonon Suazo to continue the submission date of Defendant Go Marine Services LLC's motion for partial summary judgment on plaintiff's claim for maintenance and cure is GRANTED. The submission date on Defendan's motion for partial dismissal is continued to January 22, 2025. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for partial dismissal is due on January 14, 2025 and any reply must be filed by 4:00 p.m. on January 20, 2025. See LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7.5. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 12/20/2024.(js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
26 26 motion Continue Wed 12/18 4:05 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Maintenance and Cure by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 29, 2024
25 25 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/29 3:24 PM
ORDER granting24 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/10/2025.Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 11/25/2024.(my)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 motion Continue Mon 11/25 2:08 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Maintenance and Cure by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/22 1:39 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Maintenance and Cure under McCorpen by GO Marine Services, LLC, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/11/2024.(McLaughlin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1A - 2024 Deposition of Suazo,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1B - 2011 Deposition of Suazo,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 - Selected Records of Suazo,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3A - 2010 Lawsuit of Suazo,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3B - 2015 Lawsuit of Suazo,
Att: 9 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Duplantis,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4A - GMS Go Marine Contract,
Att: 11 Exhibit 4B - Preemployment Questionnaires,
Att: 12 Exhibit 4C - Text Messages
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/22 1:24 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by GO Marine Services, LLC.(McLaughlin, Sean)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/22 1:23 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C..Attorney Sean T. McLaughlin added to party Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(McLaughlin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/14 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GO Marine Services, LLC, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C. filed by Leonon Suazo.(js)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 11/14 5:07 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 11/14/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 11/14 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal by Leonon Suazo. (Kutner, Marc) Modified text on 11/14/2024 (js)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Thu 11/14 10:52 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Leonon Suazo.(Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 09/10 8:25 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C. (Hoskin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 08/29 1:46 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the13 motion of Defendant Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C. to substitute counsel is GRANTED. Thomas Kent Morrison, Colin B. Cambre, Carlos J. Saravia, and Ashley F. Bossier are withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Bradley J. Schlotterer, Sean T. McLaughlin, and Lauren Guichard Hoskin are enrolled as counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 08/29/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/29 5:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Brandon S. Long. Status Conference set for 6/18/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Brandon S. Long. 3-4 day Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Brandon S. Long. All discovery must be completed by 5/14/2025. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 08/28 9:01 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Bradley J. Schlotterer, Sean T. McLaughlin, and Lauren Guichard Hoskin to be substituted in place of Thomas Kent Morrison, Colin B. Cambre, Carlos J. Saravia, and Ashley F. Bossier by Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.Attorney Lauren Guichard Hoskin added to party Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Hoskin, Lauren) Modified event/text on 8/28/2024 (js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/09 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2024 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/16 4:20 PM
Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C..Attorney Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison added to party Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Morrison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 06/13 1:22 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GO Marine Services, LLC (Hoskin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/13 1:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by GO Marine Services, LLC.Attorney Lauren Guichard Hoskin added to party GO Marine Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Hoskin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/14 9:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; GO Marine Services, LLC served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024. (Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/26 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (Kutner, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/16 3:08 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc Evan Kutner. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 04/16/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Notice
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/11 10:21 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marc E. Kutner (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10480211) by Leonon Suazo.(Ungar, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Consent to Electronic Filing Form,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/10 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to GO Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C..(gla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 04/10 10:05 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint - Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/09 3:26 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/09 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against GO Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10477192) filed by Leonon Suazo.Attorney Randy Jay Ungar added to party Leonon Suazo(pty:pla).(Ungar, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Request for Issuance of Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons