New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:24-cv-02683
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer A. Deutsch
39 Village Road Apt. 302
Madison, NJ 07940
Represented By
David C Kimball-Stanley
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Deepa Vanamali
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Emily Reisbaum
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Inmar, Inc.
1 West 4th Street, Suite 500
Winston Salem, NC 27101
Represented By
Robert Nathan Potter
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Richard James Keshian
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Preston Chaffee
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Premium Partners, LLC
39 Green Village Road Apartment 302
Madison, NJ 07940
Represented By
David C Kimball-Stanley
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Deepa Vanamali
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Emily Reisbaum
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gravitas Search Partners LLC
Represented By
Anthony Paduano
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Ari J. Silverman
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Corporate Does 1 and 2
Terminated: 05/09/2024


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 26, 2024
78 78 misc Letter Mon 08/26 5:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Ari Silverman dated August 26, 2024 re: Gravitas Search Partners LLC v. Jennifer Deutsch, et al., Case No. 1:24-cv-02683-MMG. Document filed by Gravitas Search Partners LLC..(Silverman, Ari)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
77 77 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 08/23 11:38 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Gravitas Search Partners LLC..(Silverman, Ari)
Related: [-]