Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:24-cv-00178
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 4:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Represented By
Jason E. Mueller
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Lauren A. Kickel
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patent Armory Inc.
Represented By
Isaac Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Fri 06/21 5:04 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (txwd_ngservice013, )
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/21 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patent Armory Inc.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/08 4:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patent Armory Inc. as to Chuy's Opco, Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/8/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/30 7:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren A. Kickel on behalf of Chuy's Opco, Inc.. Attorney Lauren A. Kickel added to party Chuy's Opco, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kickel, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/30 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Chuy's Opco, Inc.. Attorney Jason E. Mueller added to party Chuy's Opco, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mueller, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 misc Supplement to Wed 04/17 4:00 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint, Exhibits 6-10 to the Complaint for Patent Infringement by Patent Armory Inc..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 7,
Att: 2 Exhibit 8,
Att: 3 Errata 9,
Att: 4 Exhibit 10
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/10 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Chuy's Opco, Inc.. (cav)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 04/09 2:39 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/09 2:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Patent Armory Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 04/09 2:35 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/09 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Patent Armory Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18626422), filed by Patent Armory Inc..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 51 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/10 9:18 AM
Case directy assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cav)
Related: [-]