Manley v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00323 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Doris Lynne Farrar Manley v. Hartford Insurance Co, 24-CA-001815 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Marshall Dennehey, P.C. 2400 East Commercial Blvd. Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris Lynne Farrar Manley
Feldman & Lopez, P.A. 9990 SW 77th Avenue
Miami, FL 33156 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 2:36 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 4 Complaint by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Robinson, Danielle) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 7 construed motion to withdraw counsel Carolina Lopez. The submitted form does not comply with Local Rule 2.02(c) and 3.01(g). The document nevertheless operates as a notice of appearance by attorney James Sean Robertson. If he hasn't already, by April 29, 2024, attorney Robertson must update his CM/ECF profile with this court. Attorney Lopez remains as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/15/2024. (TLP) |
|
11 | 11
order
Protective Order
Mon 04/15 11:04 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/15/2024.(WRW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Mon 04/15 11:02 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/15/2024. (WRW) |
|
9 | 9
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 04/15 11:01 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/15/2024. (WRW) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 3:24 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL James S. Roberson of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 04/11 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney of Record within Firm and Designation of Email Address Appearance by James Sean Robertson, III on behalf of Doris Lynne Farrar Manley (Robertson, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/11 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Danielle N. Robinson on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Lead Counsel: Danielle N. Robinson. (Robinson, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/10 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest with Jury Demand filed by Doris Lynne Farrar Manley. Filed in State Court 3/4/2024.(CTR) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/10 8:42 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-323-SPC-NPM. (TNP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/10 8:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Carolina Lopez of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TNP) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Condemnation Fourth party complaint Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , FOURTH PARTY COMPLAINT against Doris Lynne Farrar Manley, COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Doris Lynne Farrar Manley v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, case number 24-CA-001815 filed in State Court on 3/04/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21963407 filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Packer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 State Court COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet as of April 9, 2024, | ||
Att: 9 State Court Other Documents State Court Other Documents |