Orris v. Govoni et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00874 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332fd Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Todd Belisle
|
|
Defendant
Boston Finance Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Laura Davis
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Diebert
|
|
Defendant
Leo J. Govoni
|
|
Defendant
Tracey Gregory
|
|
Defendant
Caitlin Janicki
|
|
Defendant
Carol Schroeder
|
|
Defendant
Richard Shonter
|
|
Defendant
John W. Staunton
|
|
Plaintiff
Shawnta Orris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/29 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Michael Goldberg of Filing Copy of Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay(Wirth, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 copy of Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion to Enforce Automatic Stay | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Under Rule 7.1, F.R.C.P. and L.R. 3.03 by Shawnta Orris. (Stein, Jonathan) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL J. Barton Goplerud, Brian O. Marty, Alan L. Rosca, and Paul J. Scarlato Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/25 4:24 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/25 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/25 3:49 PM
NOTICE of a related action Notice of Pendency of Other Action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Shawnta Orris. Related case(s): Yes (Stein, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
38
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/25 3:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Shawnta Orris.(Stein, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 11:11 AM
ORDERED: Plaintiff's complaint 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order, which must correct the deficiencies discussed herein. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time provided will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, without further notice. Signed by Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/11/2024. (MMS) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/10 3:24 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-874-CEH-AEP. (AA) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Shawnta Orris.(Stein, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 3:22 PM
**PER COUNSEL, FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL TO REFILE** COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Shawnta Orris.(Stein, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/9/2024 (GL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |