Faberman v. JETSET AUTOMOTIVE LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80436 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
DUFFY'S CLASSIC CARS, LLC
250 Classic Car Ct SW
Cedar Rapids, IA 52404 |
|
Defendant
JETSET AUTOMOTIVE LLC
250 Classic Car Ct SW
Cedar Rapids, IA 52404 |
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Faberman
515 N. Flagler Drive Suite P-300
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Wed 04/10 8:02 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $405.00, receipt #AFLSDC-17434965, case filed date: 4/9/2024. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb) |