New York Southern District Court
Judge:Henry J Ricardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-02687
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 5:04 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Robert Hall
Represented By
William X. Zou
Bill Zou & Associates PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Proguard Protection Inc.
Represented By
William X. Zou
Bill Zou & Associates PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Frederick Apkaki
Represented By
Joshua Levin-Epstein
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Hall
Represented By
William X. Zou
Bill Zou & Associates PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Proguard Protection Inc.
Represented By
William X. Zou
Bill Zou & Associates PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Richard Stanley
Represented By
William X. Zou
Bill Zou & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick Apkaki
Represented By
Joshua Levin-Epstein
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/20 5:52 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE Considering all the circumstances, the Court finds that the Settlement Agreement is fair and reasonable and it is hereby approved. This case, having resolved by settlement, is hereby dismissed and discontinued in its entirety, with prejudice, without costs or fees to any party, except as provided for in the parties' settlement agreement. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate all motions and deadlines, and to close this case. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 2/20/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Tue 12/10 11:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Jason Mizrahi, Esq. dated December 10, 2024 re: Dckt. No. 21. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Mon 10/07 1:27 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Jason Mizrahi, Esq. dated October 7, 2024 re: Letter Motion for Settlement Approval Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 09/24 10:32 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File at Doc. 19 is GRANTED. The Motion for Settlement Approval Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) is now due October 28, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo)(Text Only Order) (JMN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 09/20 9:47 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Settlement Approval Pursuant toCheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F. 3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jason Mizrahi, Esq. dated September 20, 2024. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 7:22 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/3/2024).(jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 10:41 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Frederick Apkaki. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/28 1:24 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The instant request is granted. The deadline for the parties to file the motion for settlement approval is hereby extended to September 20, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 15. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/28/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/28 1:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/20/2024. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 08/27 5:16 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Settlement Approval Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F. 3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jason Mizrahi, Esq. dated August 27, 2024. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/29 10:46 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
14 14 order Memo Endorsement Fri 08/23 5:03 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, filed by Frederick Apkaki ENDORSEMENT Plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter by August 28, 2024 advising whether any settlement agreement was reached in the action. If a settlement agreement was not reached, Plaintiffs counsel shall also indicate in that letter whether Plaintiff himself was advised of and consents to the dismissal of this action. If a settlement agreement was reached, the parties shall submit any settlement requiring Court approval under Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F. 3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), and any other necessary information, by September 6, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/23/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/22 8:58 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge John P. Cronan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/21 4:33 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Frederick Apkaki, Robert Hall, Proguard Protection Inc., Richard Stanley and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 1:31 PM
ORDER The Court has been informed that, during their participation in the Court-annexed Mediation Program, the parties reached an agreement on all issues. Accordingly, it is ordered that the parties shall submit any settlement requiring Court approval under Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F. 3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), and any other necessary information, by August 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 07/02 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 7/2/2024. Mediation Status due by 8/1/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 06/04 4:42 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 05/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/12/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 05/07 10:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Frederick Apkaki. Document filed by Robert Hall, Proguard Protection Inc...(Zou, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act Tue 05/07 11:57 AM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/21/2024. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/09/2020) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William X. Zou on behalf of Robert Hall, Proguard Protection Inc., Richard Stanley..(Zou, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 04/22 3:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Hall served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by MARIA PAULINO (CO-WORKER). Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/17 4:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Proguard Protection Inc. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Sou Zouky. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/11 11:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Hall, Proguard Protection Inc., Richard Stanley..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/11 9:46 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/11 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/11 9:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 04/11 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Frederick Apkaki. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 04/11 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/10 1:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Proguard Protection Inc., Robert Hall, and Richard Stanley,, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/10 1:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent to Sue Wed 04/10 1:07 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert Hall, Proguard Protection Inc., Richard Stanley. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29200244)Document filed by Frederick Apkaki..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Wed 04/10 8:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eunon Jason Mizrahi to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/15/2024. (gp)
Related: [-]