Marine Bonifacio et al v. Cowan Systems LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02688 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Supreme Court, 802254/2024E |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Cowan Intermodal Group LLC
4555 Hollins Ferry Road
Baltimore, MD 21227 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cowan Systems LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yan Marine-Abreu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zbigniew Pauperowicz
73 Lawrence Avenue
Southampton, PA 18966 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose E. Marine Bonifacio
|
|
Plaintiff
Nelsy M. Abreu De Marine
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/23 8:58 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jose E. Marine Bonifacio, Nelsy M. Abreu De Marine.(Kim, Albert) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 8:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert K. Kim on behalf of Jose E. Marine Bonifacio, Nelsy M. Abreu De Marine..(Kim, Albert) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Thu 04/11 10:42 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-02526-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 04/11 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 10:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 9:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 9:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Wed 04/10 9:41 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 1:24-cv-2526. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Related Case Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 04/09 4:50 PM
RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Jennifer Harris re: that this action be filed as related to 24cv02526 VSB. Document filed by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Cowan Systems LLC, Yan Marine-Abreu, Zbigniew Pauperowicz..(Harris, Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 4:46 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Cowan Systems LLC..(Harris, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 4:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harris, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 802254/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29196265).Document filed by Yan Marine-Abreu, Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Cowan Systems LLC, Zbigniew Pauperowicz..(Harris, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Cowan System, Cowan Intermodal and Zbigniew Pauperowicz's answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C -Summons and Complaint in Marine-Abreu v Pauperwicz |