Lee v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Walter H Rice |
Referred: | Caroline H Gentry |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:16 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irvin Lee
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/30 1:21 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/25 2:49 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Based upon a review of the Notice of Removal and Complaint, it does not appear that Defendant has plausibly alleged that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Therefore, Defendant is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4/25/2024. (acw) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
order
Order
Tue 04/16 9:25 AM
NOTATION ORDER approving5 Stipulation filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 04/16/2024. (tp) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/11 2:58 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 8:17 AM
(Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, filed by Irvin Lee. (Originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court, under case number 2024 CV 01438 on March 7, 2024.) (srb) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Tue 04/09 3:51 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 3:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.. (Lloyd, Katheryn) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery, case number 2024 CV 01438 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9911163), filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - (State Court Filing) |