v. Springer et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02139 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 3:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
Loren Alhadeff
|
|
Defendant
James Beer
|
|
Defendant
Teresa Briggs
|
|
Defendant
DocuSign, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Gaylor
|
|
Defendant
Cain A. Hayes
|
|
Defendant
Blake J. Irving
|
|
Defendant
Enrique Salem
|
|
Defendant
Michael J. Sheridan
|
|
Defendant
Peter Solvik
|
|
Defendant
Daniel D. Springer
|
|
Defendant
Inhi Cho Suh
|
|
Defendant
Mary Agnes Wilderotter
|
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
Tue 04/23 1:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE. You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Edward M. Chen upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chen's Standing Orders and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/23 10:09 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 8:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Loren Alhadeff, James Beer, Teresa Briggs, DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Cain A. Hayes, Blake J. Irving, Enrique Salem, Peter Solvik. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 04/10 8:54 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/09 3:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/09 3:47 PM
**Please see 5 , clerical error***Case assigned Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/9/2024 (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/09 3:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrie Alexander re1 Complaint, (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/09 3:09 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
1 | 1
49
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Loren Alhadeff, James Beer, Teresa Briggs, DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Cain A. Hayes, Blake J. Irving, Enrique Salem, Michael J. Sheridan, Peter Solvik, Daniel D. Springer, Inhi Cho Suh, Mary Agnes Wilderotter ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19304317.). Filed by Carrie Alexander.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |