Rogers v. Blakeman
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen K Caldwell |
Referred: | P So |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Gina Blakeman
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Rogers
129147 FAYETTE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER - KY 600 Old Frankfort Circle Inmate Mail/Parcels
LEXINGTON, KY 40510 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 4:39 PM
JUDGMENT:1. Plaintiff Steven Roger's Complaint1 is DISMISSED without prejudice.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/10/2024.(KCF) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/10 4:38 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL:1. Plaintiff Steven Roger's Complaint1 is DISMISSED without prejudice;2. This matter is STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/10/2024.(KCF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Pro Se Information Packet
Tue 04/09 3:33 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 Sample Caption | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Steven Rogers, pro se. No filing fee or IFP received.(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 envelope, not dated | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 04/09 3:33 PM
Conflict Check run. (KMP) |
||
utility
File Submitted
Tue 04/09 3:37 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review:1 Complaint (KMP) |