ORENGO AIR CORPORATION
Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-01434 |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
ORENGO AIR CORPORATION
PARCELAS JAUCA 246, CALLE 3
Santa Isabel, PR 00757 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
OFFICE OF THE US TRUSTEE (UST) OCHOA BUILDING 500 TANCA STREET SUITE 301
SAN JUAN, PR 00901 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Employment Of Professional
Mon 04/29 4:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF DEBTOR'S ATTORNEY. . Signed on 4/29/2024.(Diaz, Yolanda) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice
Fri 04/26 4:51 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by EDUARDO M VERAY on behalf of BANCO POPULAR PR - SPECIAL LOANS. (VERAY, EDUARDO) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice
Tue 04/16 11:50 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CARLOS E PEREZ PASTRANA on behalf of POPULAR AUTO LLC. (PEREZ PASTRANA, CARLOS) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of service
Sun 04/14 12:31 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 04/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of service
Sat 04/13 12:31 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Setting Status Conference
Thu 04/11 3:53 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled 6/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. . Signed on 4/11/2024.(Diaz, Yolanda) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Notice Of 341 Meeting Of Creditors - Chapter 11 & 12
Wed 04/10 9:18 AM
Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/12/2024. Proof of Claims due by 8/12/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/7/2024. (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto docket of credit card
Wed 04/10 8:12 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-01434 11] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16767162, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
7
pgs
motion
Employment
Tue 04/09 1:10 PM
Application to employ DEBTORS ATTORNEY (with 14 day objection language) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
CORPORATE RESOLUTION. Filed by JOSE M PRIETO CARBALLO on behalf of ORENGO AIR CORPORATION (PRIETO CARBALLO, JOSE) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Tue 04/09 12:53 PM
Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual With Schedules, With Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 10/7/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 10/7/2024.. Filed by JOSE M PRIETO CARBALLO on behalf of ORENGO AIR CORPORATION (PRIETO CARBALLO, JOSE) |