Moshkovich v. Blinken et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 1:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
|
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Evgenii Moshkovich
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evgenii Moshkovich (Bless, Jesse) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 06/14 9:04 AM
***Civil Case Terminated, See Docket No.13 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evgenii Moshkovich. Antony J. Blinken served on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024; Ur M. Jaddou served on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Bless, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Evgenii Moshkovich.. (Bless, Jesse) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to Antony J. Blinken, Ur M. Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jesse Matthew Bless. *Docket No. 4 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 7 .* (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jesse Matthew Bless ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19304043.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/09/2024 filed by Evgenii Moshkovich.(Bless, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/10 8:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO.4 . The information on the application must match the docket. Your name on the application doesnt match the docket (name on the docket: Jesse Matthew Bless). Either update the information on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct information reflected on it.All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-02137-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/09 3:15 PM
Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jesse M. Bless ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19304043.) filed by Evgenii Moshkovich.(Bless, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons. (David, Kristina) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Evgenii Moshkovich identifying Other Affiliate Eight Partners VC LLC for Evgenii Moshkovich. (David, Kristina) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Antony J. Blinken, Ur M. Jaddou ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19303977.). Filed by Evgenii Moshkovich.(David, Kristina) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |