California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02886
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 1:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Travis Marker
Represented By
Steven H. Bergman
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Defendant
Providence Oak Properties, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
WA Distribution LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
WWKB LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Yax Ecommerce LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Yax IP and Management Inc.
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Christine Carroll
Defendant
Matthew Crouch
Defendant
Jared Day
Defendant
Troy Marchand
Defendant
WA Amazon Seller LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Bonnie Nichols
Defendant
Parlay Law Group A Professional Corporation
Represented By
Steven H. Bergman
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Defendant
Reyhan Pasinli
Defendant
Quantum Ecommerce, LLC
Defendant
The Law Office of Travis R. Marker, A Professional Corporation
Represented By
Steven H. Bergman
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Defendant
Total-Apps, Inc.
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Nicholas Joseph Schuchert
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
David M. Gettings
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Michael S. Lowe
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wholesale Universe, Inc.
Defendant
Max K. Day
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Max O. Day
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Michael Day
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Dreams To Reality LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Evo Maxx LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Precision Trading Group, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
HouTex Farm Equity Partners LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
MKD Family Beneficiary, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
MKD Family Private Management Company, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
MKD Investment Advisor, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Max Day Consulting, LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Carroll
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Defendant
Business Financial Solutions Advisory LLC
Represented By
Joseph R. Ashby
Offit Kurman P.C.
contact info
Rachel Marie Crockett
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Lema Mousilli
Mousilli Law, PLLC
contact info
William H. Shibley
Lloyd And Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey R Davis
Law Office Of J R Davis
contact info
Plaintiff
Isabel Ramos
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Ramos
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Nibarger
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
David Hough
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Richard A Nervig
Richard Nervig Law Offices, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amund Thompson
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Richard A Nervig
Richard Nervig Law Offices, PC
contact info
Respondent
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By
Mariel Alexandria G Gerlt-Ferraro
Parker Ibrahim And Berg LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Mouloud Hocine
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Richard A Nervig
Richard Nervig Law Offices, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Lehmkuhl Hill
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Richard A Nervig
Richard Nervig Law Offices, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Panico
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Represented By
Nicolo Emerson Banks
Banks Law Office
contact info
Richard A Nervig
Richard Nervig Law Offices, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
294 294 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/02 10:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ryan Carroll, Dreams To Reality LLC, WA Amazon Seller LLC, WA Distribution LLC, Yax Ecommerce LLC, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,,292 served on 5/1/25. (Shibley, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
293 293 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 05/01 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Eric Ashton Puritsky counsel for Defendant Christine Hagar. Changing address to 11150 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 890, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Filed by Defendant Christine Hagar. (Puritsky, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
292 292 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/28 9:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER RE AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW287 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Movants are ORDERED to provide contact information (including phone number and physical mailing addresses) for Ryan Carroll, as an individual; Yax Ecommerce LLC d/b/a Wealth Assistants LLC; WA Distribution LLC; WA Amazon Sellers LLC; and Dreams to Reality LLC either in the proof of service or a separate document. Washington Defendants are currently seeking new counsel. (Ashby Declaration 7). Organization parties cannot appear pro se but instead must be represented by counsel. See Local Rule 83-2.2.2 ("Only individuals may represent themselves pro se. No organization or entity of any other kind (including corporations, limited liability corporations, partnerships, limited liability partnerships, unincorporated associations, trusts) may appear in any action or proceeding unless represented by an attorney permitted to practice before this Court under L.R. 83-2.1."). Defendants WA Distribution LLC, Washington Amazon Sellers LLC and Dreams to Reality LCC shall therefore have30 days from Movants' service of this order for new counsel to file a notice of appearance. If no such notice of appearance has been filed by that deadline, Plaintiffs may request that the Court enter defaults as to those Defendants. The case is currently stayed as to Defendant Yax Ecommerce LLC (doing business as "Wealth Assistants") due to bankruptcy proceedings. (Docket No. 216). If the stay is lifted, Defendant Yax Ecommerce LLC shall have 30 days from the lift of the stay for new counsel to file a notice of appearance. [See order for details] (lom)
Related: [-]
291 291 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/25 1:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ryan Carroll, Dreams To Reality LLC, WA Amazon Seller LLC, WA Distribution LLC, Yax Ecommerce LLC, re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,290 served on 4/24/25. (Shibley, William)
Related: [-]