White v. City Of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02691 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
John and Jane Doe 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Long Chen
|
|
Defendant
City Of New York
|
|
Defendant
Jason Lee
|
|
Plaintiff
William White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Chen, City Of New York, Jason Lee. (vf) |
|
adr
Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan
Thu 04/11 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 3:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Jason Lee, and Long Chen, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by William White..(Klein, Brett) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 1:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 1:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 1:08 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 1:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brett Harris Klein to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 7:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Jason Lee, and Long Chen, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by William White..(Klein, Brett) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 7:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Brett) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 7:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Long Chen, City Of New York, John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, Jason Lee. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29197064)Document filed by William White..(Klein, Brett) |