Hedges v. Harney & Sons Tea Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02693 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Harney & Sons Tea Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Hedges
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Assoiciates PLLC 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 11:28 AM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/12/2024) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 1:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harney & Sons Tea Corp...(gp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 12:02 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 12:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harney & Sons Tea Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 1:19 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 1:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 1:19 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 10:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Harney & Sons Tea Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29197356)Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |