Hedges v. Universal Tea Company, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02694 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Universal Tea Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Hedges
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Assoiciates PLLC 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:58 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint upon THE Defendant, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. In their discussions, the parties should consider whether plaintiff has satisfied the threshold requirement of standing. See e.g., Calcano v. Swarovski N. Am. Ltd., 36 F.4th 68, 7778 (2d Cir. 2022); Harty v. W. Point Realty, Inc., 28 F.4th 435, 44344 (2d Cir. 2022). To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45)days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter informing the Court whether the parties have settled. If the parties do not reach a settlement, the parties shall in the joint letter request that the Court (1) refer the case to mediation or a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) proceed with an initial status conference. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/15/2024) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 1:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Universal Tea Company, Inc...(gp) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 1:23 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 1:23 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 1:23 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 11:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/09 11:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Universal Tea Company, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 10:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Universal Tea Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29197358)Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |