Latif v. O'Malley
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Referred: | Victoria Reznik |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02582 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 11:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Martin O'Malley
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
Woodlawn, MD 21235
|
|
Plaintiff
Musa Abdul Latif
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
service
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action
Wed 04/10 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 6/10/2024. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 1:18 PM
ORDER: By Order dated April 9, 2024, the Court referred this case to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik for a Report and Recommendation. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. Section 636 (c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/9/2024) (mml) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 12:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/9/2024) (mml) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/09 12:32 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:5 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Musa Abdul Latif,3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Musa Abdul Latif. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/9/2024) (mml) |
|
6 | 6
order
Standing Order re Briefing of Social Security Cases
Tue 04/09 9:53 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 9:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 9:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 9:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Musa Abdul Latif..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Corona on behalf of Martin O'Malley..(Corona, Michael) | |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eddy Pierre Pierre to RE-FILE Document No. 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption title for the IFP does not exactly match the complaint caption title. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. IFP due by 4/10/2024. (pc) | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Musa Abdul Latif..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy) Modified on 4/5/2024 (pc). | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley. Document filed by Musa Abdul Latif..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy) |