Craig, Clayton v. Palm Beach Sheriff's Office et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80432 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Mon 04/15 9:53 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [DE3 ] is DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Motions terminated:3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clayton Michael Craig. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 04/15 9:50 AM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 10:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Michael Craig. (kma) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 04/09 10:56 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens
Tue 04/09 10:43 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Ivett Cardelli, Palm Beach County Department of Corrections, Palm Beach Sheriff's Office, Wellpath Medical LLC. Filing fee $ 405.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Clayton Michael Craig.(kma) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts & Memorandum of Law |