Andrews et al v. 3M Company et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas L Ludington |
Referred: | Patricia T Morris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10897 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 11:06 PM EDT |
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours, Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions, LP
|
|
Defendant
E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Clariant, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemdesign Products, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA, Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, L.P
|
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US, Inc
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Jo Lansky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Krawczak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melva E. Koepke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Dale Kirian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stuart Mahaffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Alan Potts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derold Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa McFadden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deloris Gail Michalak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Parks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia A. Godoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Sexton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lamar B. Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Roger Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cyprian Edward Yost
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiderio Jauregui
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald E. Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Margaret Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Franklin Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mike Bussey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Bylsma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Cararini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leaann Mary Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zoanne Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashlee Cody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Dickey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Lee Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mindy Gianettino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina Hammel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvis Hanbaum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Hanbaum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vivian Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda L. Kappen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 04/29 1:54 PM
Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:24-cv-02468, filed 04/25/2024. (VLun) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/24 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Transfer to the District of South Carolina for MDL 2873 (SSch) |
|
5 | 5
order
MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out
Wed 04/24 1:47 PM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-183) to District of South Carolina for MDL # 2873. (SSch) |
|
4 | 4
order
MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out
Wed 04/24 9:45 AM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-183) for MDL # 2873. [Informational Copy] (SSch) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 04/24 1:53 PM
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. (SSch) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error*
Tue 04/09 11:29 AM
Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge David M. Lawson* and *Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman* in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City (SSch) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Tue 04/09 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (JHea) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Tue 04/09 10:54 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JHea) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9742598 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Iosca County - County Where Action Arose: Iosca County - County of 1st Defendant: Iosca County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Foley, Raymond) |